California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB274 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 9, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill May 14, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013