|
10/11/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 755, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2285.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3001.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1190.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1010.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 467.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|