LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB277
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB277
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB277
Compare Versions
SB277 Chaptered October 11, 2013
SB277 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB277 Amended June 18, 2013
SB277 Amended May 13, 2013
SB277 Amended March 21, 2013
SB277 Introduced February 14, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB277 Chaptered October 11, 2013
SB277 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB277 Amended June 18, 2013
SB277 Amended May 13, 2013
SB277 Amended March 21, 2013
SB277 Introduced February 14, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare