|
09/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 414, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2134.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 5. Page 2830.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2670.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 674.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 391.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Set for hearing April 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|