California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB286 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 14, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 6, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2013

Amended

Bill August 22, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill June 24, 2013
Bill June 11, 2013
Bill March 18, 2013