|
08/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1849.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2483.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1093.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 989.) (May 20).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|