California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB295 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2013

Amended

Bill June 20, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013