California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB299 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 19, 2013
Bill April 10, 2013