LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB299
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB299
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB299
Compare Versions
SB299 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB299 Amended September 3, 2013
SB299 Amended August 5, 2013
SB299 Amended June 19, 2013
SB299 Amended April 10, 2013
SB299 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB299 Enrolled September 11, 2013
SB299 Amended September 3, 2013
SB299 Amended August 5, 2013
SB299 Amended June 19, 2013
SB299 Amended April 10, 2013
SB299 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare