Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2013
|
Amendments by Senator Anderson tabled on motion of Senator Corbett. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 1459.) Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1459.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1152.) .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1005.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2013
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 290.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Set for hearing March 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/04/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/03/2012
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|