LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB30
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB30
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB30
Compare Versions
SB30 Amended August 13, 2013
SB30 Amended May 30, 2013
SB30 Amended May 28, 2013
SB30 Amended March 6, 2013
SB30 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB30 Amended August 13, 2013
SB30 Amended May 30, 2013
SB30 Amended May 28, 2013
SB30 Amended March 6, 2013
SB30 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare