|
10/03/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 516, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/03/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2287.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3017.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2953.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1100.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 733.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|