LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB305
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB305
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB305
Compare Versions
SB305 Chaptered October 3, 2013
SB305 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB305 Amended September 6, 2013
SB305 Amended September 3, 2013
SB305 Amended August 5, 2013
SB305 Amended June 19, 2013
SB305 Amended June 14, 2013
SB305 Amended April 25, 2013
SB305 Amended April 15, 2013
SB305 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB305 Chaptered October 3, 2013
SB305 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB305 Amended September 6, 2013
SB305 Amended September 3, 2013
SB305 Amended August 5, 2013
SB305 Amended June 19, 2013
SB305 Amended June 14, 2013
SB305 Amended April 25, 2013
SB305 Amended April 15, 2013
SB305 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare