California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB313 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013
Bill August 20, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013