LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB313
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB313
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB313
Compare Versions
SB313 Chaptered October 12, 2013
SB313 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB313 Amended September 6, 2013
SB313 Enrolled August 20, 2013
SB313 Amended April 24, 2013
SB313 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB313 Chaptered October 12, 2013
SB313 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB313 Amended September 6, 2013
SB313 Enrolled August 20, 2013
SB313 Amended April 24, 2013
SB313 Introduced February 15, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare