California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB344 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Amended

Bill September 12, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 15, 2013
Bill August 7, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 8, 2013
Bill April 17, 2013