LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB344
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB344
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB344
Compare Versions
SB344 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB344 Amended September 12, 2013
SB344 Amended September 6, 2013
SB344 Amended September 3, 2013
SB344 Amended August 15, 2013
SB344 Amended August 7, 2013
SB344 Amended May 24, 2013
SB344 Amended May 8, 2013
SB344 Amended April 17, 2013
SB344 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB344 Enrolled September 18, 2013
SB344 Amended September 12, 2013
SB344 Amended September 6, 2013
SB344 Amended September 3, 2013
SB344 Amended August 15, 2013
SB344 Amended August 7, 2013
SB344 Amended May 24, 2013
SB344 Amended May 8, 2013
SB344 Amended April 17, 2013
SB344 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare