|
10/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 681, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2422.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 3222.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2550.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 947.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 852.) (May 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|