California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB345 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2013

Amended

Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 21, 2013