|
10/08/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 658, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 2369.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 3063.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2938.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2476.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 710.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 663.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 485.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|