California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB346 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 17, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 8, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill August 8, 2013
Bill May 30, 2013
Bill April 2, 2013