|
09/09/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 287, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1970.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2555.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 973.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 882.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Set for hearing May 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|