California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB375 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013

Amended

Bill August 5, 2013
Bill May 2, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013