|
08/22/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4399.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2014
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5918.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2014
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2139.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2051.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Set for hearing August 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1246.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Set for hearing June 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|