California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB384 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2014

Chaptered

Bill August 22, 2014

Amended

Bill August 4, 2014
Bill June 24, 2014
Bill June 2, 2014
Bill May 12, 2014
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 25, 2013