Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3322.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 11). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3147.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected September 11.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2959.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Set, second hearing. Referred to Appropriations suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 8). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1199.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1005.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 749.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 590.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2013
|
Set for hearing April 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/06/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/05/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|