California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB39 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 5, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 18, 2013

Chaptered

Bill October 12, 2013

Amended

Bill September 10, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill August 5, 2013
Bill May 28, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill March 21, 2013