California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB392 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2013

Amended

Bill August 5, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill May 2, 2013