LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB392
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB392
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB392
Compare Versions
SB392 Chaptered September 24, 2013
SB392 Enrolled September 4, 2013
SB392 Amended August 5, 2013
SB392 Amended June 25, 2013
SB392 Amended May 2, 2013
SB392 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB392 Chaptered September 24, 2013
SB392 Enrolled September 4, 2013
SB392 Amended August 5, 2013
SB392 Amended June 25, 2013
SB392 Amended May 2, 2013
SB392 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare