|
09/15/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 318, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4719.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4671.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Set for hearing August 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4543.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 1. Page 6028.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 5424.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/23/2014
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Reconsideration granted. (Page 3311.) Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Rendon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 34. Page 3250.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Rendon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2953.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 1150.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Made Special Order for Wednesday, May 29, at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1013.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 568.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|