California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 20, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 15, 2014

Amended

Bill June 5, 2014
Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill May 15, 2013
Bill April 3, 2013