California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB4 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 3, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2013

Amended

Bill September 6, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill August 19, 2013
Bill August 6, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill June 18, 2013
Bill May 24, 2013
Bill May 7, 2013
Bill April 24, 2013
Bill March 11, 2013