LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB4
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB4
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB4
Compare Versions
SB4 Chaptered September 20, 2013
SB4 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB4 Amended September 6, 2013
SB4 Amended September 3, 2013
SB4 Amended August 19, 2013
SB4 Amended August 6, 2013
SB4 Amended June 25, 2013
SB4 Amended June 18, 2013
SB4 Amended May 24, 2013
SB4 Amended May 7, 2013
SB4 Amended April 24, 2013
SB4 Amended March 11, 2013
SB4 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB4 Chaptered September 20, 2013
SB4 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB4 Amended September 6, 2013
SB4 Amended September 3, 2013
SB4 Amended August 19, 2013
SB4 Amended August 6, 2013
SB4 Amended June 25, 2013
SB4 Amended June 18, 2013
SB4 Amended May 24, 2013
SB4 Amended May 7, 2013
SB4 Amended April 24, 2013
SB4 Amended March 11, 2013
SB4 Introduced December 3, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare