|
10/11/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 759, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2364.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 60. Noes 13. Page 3006.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 905.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 816.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 663.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 486.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|