LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB400
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB400
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB400
Compare Versions
SB400 Chaptered October 11, 2013
SB400 Enrolled September 17, 2013
SB400 Amended August 6, 2013
SB400 Amended June 27, 2013
SB400 Amended April 16, 2013
SB400 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB400 Chaptered October 11, 2013
SB400 Enrolled September 17, 2013
SB400 Amended August 6, 2013
SB400 Amended June 27, 2013
SB400 Amended April 16, 2013
SB400 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare