|
10/01/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 468, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/01/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2279.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Amendments by Assembly Member Morrell tabled on motion by Assembly Member Atkins. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 2957.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2958.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1180.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1013.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 667.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|