LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB416
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB416
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB416
Compare Versions
SB416 Chaptered October 1, 2013
SB416 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB416 Amended September 3, 2013
SB416 Amended August 19, 2013
SB416 Amended August 7, 2013
SB416 Amended June 24, 2013
SB416 Amended May 28, 2013
SB416 Amended May 1, 2013
SB416 Amended April 17, 2013
SB416 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB416 Chaptered October 1, 2013
SB416 Enrolled September 12, 2013
SB416 Amended September 3, 2013
SB416 Amended August 19, 2013
SB416 Amended August 7, 2013
SB416 Amended June 24, 2013
SB416 Amended May 28, 2013
SB416 Amended May 1, 2013
SB416 Amended April 17, 2013
SB416 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare