Assembly
|
02/03/2014
|
Returned to Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 971.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 750.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Set for hearing April 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|