LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB418
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB418
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB418
Compare Versions
SB418 Amended June 26, 2013
SB418 Amended June 11, 2013
SB418 Amended April 22, 2013
SB418 Amended April 8, 2013
SB418 Amended April 1, 2013
SB418 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB418 Amended June 26, 2013
SB418 Amended June 11, 2013
SB418 Amended April 22, 2013
SB418 Amended April 8, 2013
SB418 Amended April 1, 2013
SB418 Introduced February 20, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare