|
07/11/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1600.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2130.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 805.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 663.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|