LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB426
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB426
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB426
Compare Versions
SB426 Chaptered July 11, 2013
SB426 Enrolled July 2, 2013
SB426 Amended June 11, 2013
SB426 Amended April 1, 2013
SB426 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB426 Chaptered July 11, 2013
SB426 Enrolled July 2, 2013
SB426 Amended June 11, 2013
SB426 Amended April 1, 2013
SB426 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare