|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 256, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1973.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2672.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/21/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/20/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 867.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 641.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|