California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB427 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 27, 2013

Chaptered

Bill September 9, 2013
Bill September 6, 2013

Amended

Bill May 21, 2013
Bill April 8, 2013