|
09/28/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 413, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2374.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 3177.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 2951.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 1200.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1006.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 750.) (April 30).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Re-referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2013
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/12/2012
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/11/2012
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|