LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB43
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB43
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB43
Compare Versions
SB43 Chaptered September 28, 2013
SB43 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB43 Amended September 6, 2013
SB43 Amended September 3, 2013
SB43 Amended August 6, 2013
SB43 Amended June 15, 2013
SB43 Amended May 28, 2013
SB43 Amended May 24, 2013
SB43 Amended May 15, 2013
SB43 Amended May 8, 2013
SB43 Amended April 1, 2013
SB43 Introduced December 11, 2012
Version 1 (Old)
SB43 Chaptered September 28, 2013
SB43 Enrolled September 16, 2013
SB43 Amended September 6, 2013
SB43 Amended September 3, 2013
SB43 Amended August 6, 2013
SB43 Amended June 15, 2013
SB43 Amended May 28, 2013
SB43 Amended May 24, 2013
SB43 Amended May 15, 2013
SB43 Amended May 8, 2013
SB43 Amended April 1, 2013
SB43 Introduced December 11, 2012
Version 2 (New)
Compare