|
09/29/2014
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2014
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/04/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 8. Page 4912.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 4671.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4637.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 22. Page 6192.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/06/2014
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 903.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 15. Page 866.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Hernandez. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 866.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 719.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 507.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Set for hearing April 10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|