LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB455
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB455
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB455
Compare Versions
SB455 Enrolled August 29, 2014
SB455 Amended August 6, 2014
SB455 Amended June 25, 2013
SB455 Amended June 10, 2013
SB455 Amended April 16, 2013
SB455 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
SB455 Enrolled August 29, 2014
SB455 Amended August 6, 2014
SB455 Amended June 25, 2013
SB455 Amended June 10, 2013
SB455 Amended April 16, 2013
SB455 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare