|
10/13/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 797, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/20/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2370.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 66. Noes 10. Page 3132.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Page 2946.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/19/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 943.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 816.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2013
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 468.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|