LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB458
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB458
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB458
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 21, 2013
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 17, 2013
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 13, 2013
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 6, 2013
Compare
Bill
June 20, 2013
Compare
Bill
June 11, 2013
Compare
Bill
May 14, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 29, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 16, 2013
Compare
Bill
April 1, 2013
Compare