Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 52. Noes 25. Page 3283.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (September 11). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3147.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2013
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 2954.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/05/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2013
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1156.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1014.) (May 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Set for hearing May 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Set for hearing May 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 667.) (April 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Set for hearing April 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Set for hearing April 9.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|